Photopoulos, Peter (CPSO#: 62502)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Aug 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 805
1243 Islington Avenue
Toronto ON  M8X 1Y9
Phone: (647) 256-3111
Fax: (416) 644-1892
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Patricia Hose and Peter Photopoulos Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 12 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Photopoulos ( CPSO# 62502 )
Dr. P. Hose ( CPSO# 55865 )

Business Address:
Suite 805
1243 Islington Avenue
Toronto ON  M8X 1Y9
Phone Number: (647) 256-3111

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER PHOTOPOULOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PHOTOPOULOS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 1991