Phua, Jason (CPSO#: 84104)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Mar 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Mar 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:National University of Singapore, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2006 to 05 Jun 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 06 Jun 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Mar 2007
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2007