Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Piacentino, Angelo (CPSO#: 60992)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
170 Queensway West
Suite 202
Mississauga ON  L5B 3A8
Phone: (905) 275-3822
Fax: (905) 275-4001
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Angelo Piacentino Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 27 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Piacentino ( CPSO# 60992 )

Business Address:
202 - 170 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 3A8
Phone Number: (905) 275-0185

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANGELO PIACENTINO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PIACENTINO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1990