Pianezza, Michael Lawrence (CPSO#: 77722)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jul 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Ottawa, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 101
845 Regent Street
Sudbury ON  P3E 4T3
Phone: (705) 222-6444
Fax: (705) 222-6447
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael L. Pianezza Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 29 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Pianezza ( CPSO# 77722 )

Business Address:
101 - 845 Regent Street
Sudbury ON  P3E 4T3
Phone Number: (705) 222-6444

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL LAWRENCE PIANEZZA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PIANEZZA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008