Pianosi, Paolo Torquato (CPSO#: 51337)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 20 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 20 Jul 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian

Education:University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 19 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 25 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Apr 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Jul 1990