Piatek, Dariusz Piotr (CPSO#: 60085)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 12 Aug 2008

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 303
4265 Sherwoodtowne Blvd
Mississauga ON  L4Z 1Y5
Phone: (905) 238-1217
Fax: (905) 238-1796
Electoral District: 05

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Fitness to Practise Committee Effective: 31 Dec 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Fitness to Practise Committee Effective: 31 Dec 2013 Active View Details [+]
            As from 11:59 p.m., December 31, 2013, by order of the Fitness to Practise
            Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following
            terms, conditions and limitations are imposed on the certificate of
            registration held by Dr. Dariusz Piotr Piatek:

            *     Dr. Piatek shall not engage in the practice of medicine unless he meets
                  the following conditions:

                  (a)   Within 90 days of this Order, Dr. Piatek shall retain a qualified
                        psychiatrist or psychologist with  expertise in treatment of
                        personality disorders and delusional disorder and acceptable to the
                        College ("Psychiatric Monitor");
                  
                  (b)   Dr. Piatek will consent to the College providing the Psychiatric
                        Monitor with the Decision and Reasons of the Committee on
                        incapacity dated April 18, 2013; the Decision and Reasons of the
                        Committee regarding the disposition including the Order; the report
                        of Dr. Hill (exhibit #52); and the reports of Dr. Donald Young, Dr.
                        Brian Hoffman, Dr. Gary Rodin and Dr. Hy Bloom. As part of the
                        Undertaking described below, the Psychiatric Monitor shall be
                        required to read and review all of the foregoing;
                  
                  (c)   The Psychiatric Monitor shall execute an Undertaking with the
                        College in a form satisfactory to the College which, among other
                        things, shall require the Psychiatric Monitor to :
                  
                        (i)   Provide written reports to the College every three months;
                              and
                        (ii)  If the psychiatric monitor determines that Dr. Piatek's
                              condition may affect his care of patients, that he has failed
                              to attend for appointments, or that he is not in compliance
                              with this Order, the psychiatric monitor shall make an
                              immediate report to the College.
                  
                  (d)   Dr. Piatek shall attend his Psychiatric Monitor for active
                        psychotherapy at least once weekly, focussing on treatment of his
                        condition and management of associated behaviors;
                  
                  (e)   The Psychiatric Monitor may request any information of Dr. Piatek
                        or the College that the Psychiatric Monitor deems necessary or
                        desirable for the monitor to fulfill his or her obligations,
                        including such information that may be necessary for the
                        Psychiatric Monitor to verify statements of Dr. Piatek. Dr. Piatek
                        shall cooperate with the Psychiatric Monitor in this regard.
                  
                  (f)   Within 90 days of the Order, Dr. Piatek shall retain a clinical
                        monitor ("Clinical Monitor") who is acceptable to the College;
                  
                  (g)   Dr. Piatek will consent to the College providing the Clinical
                        Monitor with the Decision and Reasons of the Committee on
                        incapacity dated April 18, 2013; the Decision and Reasons of the
                        Committee regarding the disposition including the Order; the report
                        of Dr. Hill (exhibit #52); and the reports of Dr. Donald Young, Dr.
                        Brian Hoffman, Dr. Gary Rodin and Dr. Hy Bloom. As part of the
                        Undertaking described below, the Clinical Monitor shall be required
                        to read and review all of the foregoing;
                  
            (h)   The Clinical Monitor will execute an Undertaking with the College in a
                  form satisfactory to the College which, among other things, shall require
                  the Clinical Monitor to report to the College immediately if Dr. Piatek's
                  patient care or record keeping represents a risk to his patients;

            (i)   Once every two weeks, the Clinical Monitor shall: (i) attend Dr. Piatek's
                  practice to observe Dr. Piatek's care and treatment of two or more
                  patients selected in accordance with the Clinical Monitor's discretion;
                  and (ii) review at least ten patient records randomly selected by the
                  Clinical Monitor;

            (j)   The Clinical Monitor shall provide reports to the College once every
                  three months in respect of Dr. Piatek's patient care and record keeping;

            (k)   The Clinical Monitor may request any information of Dr. Piatek or the
                  College that the Clinical Monitor deems necessary or desirable for the
                  monitor to fulfill his or her obligations, including such information
                  that may be necessary for the Clinical Monitor to verify statements of
                  Dr. Piatek. Dr. Piatek shall cooperate with the Clinical Monitor in this
                  regard.

            (l)   Dr. Piatek shall consent to the disclosure by his Clinical Monitor to the
                  College, and by the College to his Clinical Monitor, of all information
                  the Clinical Monitor or the College deems necessary or desirable in order
                  to fulfill the Clinical Monitor's Undertaking and to monitor Dr. Piatek's
                  compliance with the Order.  

            (m)   The reports of Dr. Piatek's Clinical Monitor shall be provided by the
                  College to the Psychiatric Monitor. The Psychiatric Monitor may request
                  any further information from the Clinical Monitor or from the College
                  that the Psychiatric Monitor deems necessary or desirable in order to
                  permit the Psychiatric Monitor to perform the terms of the Undertaking;

            (n)   Dr. Piatek shall abide by all recommendations of his Clinical Monitor
                  with respect to practice improvements and education;

            (o)   If the Psychiatric Monitor or the Clinical Monitor who has given the
                  Undertaking is unwilling or unable to continue to fulfil its terms, Dr.
                  Piatek shall cease to practise immediately until such time as he has
                  retained another Psychiatric Monitor or Clinical Monitor acceptable to
                  the College;

            (p)   Dr. Piatek shall be solely responsible for all fees, costs and expenses
                  associated with the terms of this Order;

            (q)   This Order shall take effect 90 days after the date of the Order. The
                  terms of the current Order under s. 62 of the Code shall remain in force
                  until the terms of this Order take effect; and

            (r)   The clinical monitoring and the psychiatric monitoring described in this
                  Order are to be for an indefinite period.

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 27 Nov 2013
Summary:

 On November 27, 2013, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Dariusz Piotr Piatek committed an act 
 of professional misconduct, in that he has been found guilty of an offence that his relevant to 
 his suitability to practise, and in that he engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice 
 of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members 
 as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. Dr. Piatek admitted the allegations. 

On 
 December 19, 2011, Dr. Piatek plead guilty to, and was convicted of, the following charge: that he 
 did, in the city of Mississauga, between January 1, 2008 and July 30, 2009, submit billings to the 
 Ontario Health Insurance Plan that did not comply with the requirements of the Schedule of 
 Benefits and did thereby commit an offense contrary to the Health Insurance Act, Section 
 44(1)(a).

Dr. Piatek has been found guilty of professional misconduct by the CPSO's Discipline 
 Committee on one prior occasion. On August 12, 2008, he admitted to having been found guilty of an 
 offence that is relevant to his suitability to practice by willfully evading the payment of income 
 taxes.

Dr. Piatek is currently subject to terms, conditions and limitations imposed by Order of 
 the Fitness to Practise Committee of the College.

The Discipline Committee ordered and directed 
 that:

Dr. Piatek attend before the panel to be reprimanded.
Dr. Piatek pay to the College costs 
 in the amount of $4,460 within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): November 27, 2013


Committee: Fitness To Practise
Decision Date: 18 Apr 2013
Summary:

On April 18, 2013, the Fitness to Practise Committee found that Dr. Dariusz Piotr Piatek is 
incapacitated, as defined in s. 1(1) of the Health Professions Procedural Code. 
 
On October 2, 2013, the Committee ordered and directed that the following terms, conditions and 
limitations be placed on Dr. Piatek's certificate of registration:  
 
      Dr. Piatek shall not engage in the practice of medicine unless he meets the following 
      conditions: 
 
(a)   Within 90 days of this Order, Dr. Piatek shall retain a qualified psychiatrist or 
      psychologist with   expertise in treatment of personality disorders and delusional disorder 
      and acceptable to the College ("Psychiatric Monitor"); 
 
(b)   Dr. Piatek will consent to the College providing the Psychiatric Monitor with the 
      Decision and Reasons of the Committee on incapacity dated April 18, 2013; the Decision 
      and Reasons of the Committee regarding the disposition including the Order; the report of 
      Dr. Hill (exhibit #52); and the reports of Dr. Donald Young, Dr. Brian Hoffman, Dr. Gary 
      Rodin and Dr. Hy Bloom. As part of the Undertaking described below, the Psychiatric 
      Monitor shall be required to read and review all of the foregoing; 
 
(c)   The Psychiatric Monitor shall execute an Undertaking with the College in a form 
      satisfactory to the College which, among other things, shall require the Psychiatric 
      Monitor to: 
      (i)   Provide written reports to the College every three months; and 
      (ii)  If the psychiatric monitor determines that Dr. Piatek's condition may affect his 
            care of patients, that he has failed to attend for appointments, or that he is not in 
            compliance with this Order, the psychiatric monitor shall make an immediate 
            report to the College. 
 
(d)   Dr. Piatek shall attend his Psychiatric Monitor for active psychotherapy at least once 
      weekly, focussing on treatment of his condition and management of associated behaviors; 
 
(e)   The Psychiatric Monitor may request any information of Dr. Piatek or the College that the 
      Psychiatric Monitor deems necessary or desirable for the monitor to fulfill his or her 
      obligations, including such information that may be necessary for the Psychiatric Monitor 
      to verify statements of Dr. Piatek. Dr. Piatek shall cooperate with the Psychiatric Monitor 
      in this regard. 
 
(f)   Within 90 days of the Order, Dr. Piatek shall retain a clinical monitor ("Clinical 
      Monitor") who is acceptable to the College; 
 
(g)   Dr. Piatek will consent to the College providing the Clinical Monitor with the Decision 
      and Reasons of the Committee on incapacity dated April 18, 2013; the Decision and 
      Reasons of the Committee regarding the disposition including the Order; the report of Dr. 
      Hill (exhibit #52); and the reports of Dr. Donald Young, Dr. Brian Hoffman, Dr. Gary 
      Rodin and Dr. Hy Bloom. As part of the Undertaking described below, the Clinical 
      Monitor shall be required to read and review all of the foregoing; 
(h)   The Clinical Monitor will execute an Undertaking with the College in a form satisfactory 
      to the College which, among other things, shall require the Clinical Monitor to report to 
      the College immediately if Dr. Piatek's patient care or record keeping represents a risk to 
      his patients; 
 
(i)   Once every two weeks, the Clinical Monitor shall: (i) attend Dr. Piatek's practice to 
      observe Dr. Piatek's care and treatment of two or more patients selected in accordance 
      with the Clinical Monitor's discretion; and (ii) review at least ten patient records 
      randomly selected by the Clinical Monitor; 
 
(j)   The Clinical Monitor shall provide reports to the College once every three months in 
      respect of Dr. Piatek's patient care and record keeping; 
 
(k)   The Clinical Monitor may request any information of Dr. Piatek or the College that the 
      Clinical Monitor deems necessary or desirable for the monitor to fulfill his or her 
      obligations, including such information that may be necessary for the Clinical Monitor to 
      verify statements of Dr. Piatek. Dr. Piatek shall cooperate with the Clinical Monitor in 
      this regard. 
 
(l)   Dr. Piatek shall consent to the disclosure by his Clinical Monitor to the College, and by 
      the College to his Clinical Monitor, of all information the Clinical Monitor or the College 
      deems necessary or desirable in order to fulfill the Clinical Monitor's Undertaking and to 
      monitor Dr. Piatek's compliance with the Order.   
 
(m)   The reports of Dr. Piatek's Clinical Monitor shall be provided by the College to the 
      Psychiatric Monitor. The Psychiatric Monitor may request any further information from 
      the Clinical Monitor or from the College that the Psychiatric Monitor deems necessary or 
      desirable in order to permit the Psychiatric Monitor to perform the terms of the 
      Undertaking; 
 
(n)   Dr. Piatek shall abide by all recommendations of his Clinical Monitor with respect to 
      practice improvements and education; 
 
(o)   If the Psychiatric Monitor or the Clinical Monitor who has given the Undertaking is 
      unwilling or unable to continue to fulfil its terms, Dr. Piatek shall cease to practise 
      immediately until such time as he has retained another Psychiatric Monitor or Clinical 
      Monitor acceptable to the College; 
 
(p)   Dr. Piatek shall be solely responsible for all fees, costs and expenses associated with the 
      terms of this Order; 
 
(q)   This Order shall take effect 90 days after the date of the Order. The terms of the current 
      Order under s. 62 of the Code shall remain in force until the terms of this Order take 
      effect; and 
 
(r)   The clinical monitoring and the psychiatric monitoring described in this Order are to be 
      for an indefinite period. 
 
 

Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): April 19-20, May 17, July 31-Aug 2, Oct 1&5, 2012


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 12 Aug 2008
Summary:

 On August 12, 2008, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Piatek to have committed an act of 
 professional misconduct in that he has been found guilty of an offence that is relevant to his 
 suitability to practise; and, that he engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of 
 medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as 
 disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

The Discipline Committee ordered and directed 
 that:

1. 	Dr. Piatek appear before the panel to be reprimanded.

2.   	The Registrar to impose 
 the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Piatek(s certificate of registration: 
 

(a)	 Dr. Piatek shall successfully complete, at his own expense, the College(s Medical Ethics 
 and Informed Consent course on the next available date and provide proof thereof to the College.

 
 3.  	Dr. Piatek to pay to the College costs in the amount of $1,825.00 within ninety (90) days of 
 the date of this Order.

4.  	The results of this proceeding to be included in the register.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Aug 12, 2008