Picard, Aline Gilberte (CPSO#: 33635)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 28 Aug 1989

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Ottawa, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 05 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Jul 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Aug 1989