Pickering, John Geoffrey (CPSO#: 52856)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Dec 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
University Hospital
339 Windermere Road
P O Box 5339
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3973
Fax: (519) 434-3278
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. G. Pickering Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 24 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Pickering ( CPSO# 52856 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
University Hospital
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-3973

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 27 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN GEOFFREY PICKERING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PICKERING is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1983 to 11 Jun 1984
Other - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 4 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 1985