Pidutti, Richard Warren (CPSO#: 31922)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1995

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 29 Aug 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Apr 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1995