Pierce, Charles Harmon (CPSO#: 25565)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 26 Oct 1987

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 26 Oct 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 May 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Sep 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jun 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 26 Oct 1987