Piercey, Kevin Roy (CPSO#: 59582)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 May 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University
Institute of Urology
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 34987
Fax: (905) 521-6126
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hamilton Health Sciences Centre
Henderson Site
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kevin Piercey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 26 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Piercey ( CPSO# 59582 )

Business Address:
McMaster University
Institute of Urology
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 29 Aug 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KEVIN ROY PIERCEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PIERCEY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 May 1990