Pierre, Andrew Frederick (CPSO#: 66471)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jun 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
9N 959
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-5354
Fax: (416) 340-4556
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrew Pierre Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 10 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Pierre ( CPSO# 66471 )

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
Room 9N - 959
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-5354

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist
Thoracic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW FREDERICK PIERRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PIERRE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Resident 5 - Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Resident 6 - Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2002