Pierre, Sean Anthony (CPSO#: 76057)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 250
1130 Morrison Drive
Ottawa ON  K2H 9N6
Phone: (613) 221-9200
Fax: (613) 221-9300
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Canada
Phone: (613) 721-2000
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sean Pierre Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 30 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Pierre ( CPSO# 76057 )

Business Address:
250 - 1130 Morrison Drive
Ottawa ON  K2H 9N6
Phone Number: (613) 221-9200

Business Address:
The Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-2000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SEAN ANTHONY PIERRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PIERRE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2008