Pierre-Louis, Marie Laurette (CPSO#: 51340)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 May 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Creole, English, French

Education:University of Lausanne, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 400
2555 Boulevard St Joseph
Orleans ON  K1C 1S6
Phone: (613) 841-2320
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 24 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIE LAURETTE PIERRE-LOUIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PIERRE-LOUIS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Mar 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Nov 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 May 2009