Pierse, Michael Patrick (CPSO#: 83246)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Aug 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Patrick Pierse Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 10 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario 401 Smyth Road Ottawa ON K1G 6W3
Date Received: 30 May 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Paediatric Emergency Medicine Effective: 26 Sep 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 15 Nov 2010 to 12 Dec 2010
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Nov 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Dec 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Aug 2017