Pigeon, Michel Bernard Joseph (CPSO#: 25683)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jun 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Dec 2007

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Waypoint Centre for M H C
500 Church Street
Penetanguishene ON  L9M 1G3
Phone: (705) 549-3181
Fax: (705) 549-1812
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 15 Mar 1978 RCPSC Specialist
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHEL BERNARD JOSEPH PIGEON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PIGEON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1977 to 30 Jun 1978
Resident 1 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Dec 2007

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Fitness To Practise
Decision Date: 08 Jun 1981
Summary:

 On June 8, 1981, the Fitness to Practise Committee found Dr. Pigeon to be incapacitated and issued 
 an order.   On December 14, 2007, the Fitness to Practise Committee released Dr. Pigeon from the 
 order of June 8, 1981.

Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 08 Jun 1981