Pignatiello, Antonio (CPSO#: 58101)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Aug 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hospital For Sick Children
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-2188
Fax: (416) 813-7223
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Antonio Pignatiello Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 15 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Pignatiello ( CPSO# 58101 )

Business Address:
Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Suite 1126
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-2188

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 29 May 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANTONIO PIGNATIELLO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PIGNATIELLO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 1988