Pike, Jeffrey Mark (CPSO#: 89414)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 20 Aug 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2009