Pike, John Grant (CPSO#: 55124)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Oct 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 14 Feb 1985 to 13 Mar 1985
Elective Trainee - Urology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Urology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 5 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Feb 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Mar 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2000
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Jun 2012