Pike, Malcolm John (CPSO#: 42443)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Apr 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Tasmania, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
Adult Diabetes Education Centre
1 Hospital Dr, Room W4920
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone: (705) 740-8324
Fax: (705) 740-8032
Electoral District: 06

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 10 Jun 1981 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 08 Mar 2017 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MALCOLM JOHN PIKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PIKE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Apr 1983