Pike, Pamela Anne (CPSO#: 80047)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Mar 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Mar 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 04 Aug 2003 to 31 Aug 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 06 Mar 2006 to 31 Mar 2006
Elective Trainee - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Mar 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2006