Pikula, Aleksandra (CPSO#: 104799)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Sep 2014

Expiry Date:  31 Aug 2021

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Sep 2014

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Bosnian, Croatian, English, Serbian

Education:University of Belgrade, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital (UHN)
Division of Neurology
399 Bathurst Street
West Wing, 5th Floor
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: 416-603-5826
Fax: 416-6035768
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pikula Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 15 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Pikula ( CPSO# 104799)

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital (UHN)
Division of Neurology
399 Bathurst Street
West Wing 5th Floor, Suite 432
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5826

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 01 Sep 2014 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2014
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Sep 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Aug 2021

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Sep 2014 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Aleksandra Pikula may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
                        Division of Neurology, University of Toronto, in which Dr. Pikula
                        holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor,
                        and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Pikula  no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Pikula's clinical
                        performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or
                        academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Pikula's certificate
                        of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on September 1, 2014.  In accordance with
                  paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the
                  Registration Committee, automatically expire on August 31, 2021.