Pilar, Imelda Santa Ana (CPSO#: 77245)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jan 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jan 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tagalog

Education:University of The East Philippines, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 360
1420 Burnhamthorpe Road East
Mississauga ON  L4X 2Z9
Phone: (905) 614-1944
Fax: (905) 614-1897
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jan 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IMELDA SANTA ANA PILAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PILAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 07 Jan 2002 to 06 Jan 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 07 Jan 2003 to 06 Jan 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2004