Pilarski, Barbara Anne (CPSO#: 61080)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Jan 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Feb 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 804
1243 Islington Avenue
Toronto ON  M8X 1Y9
Phone: (416) 762-1233
Fax: (416) 762-1236
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Barbara Pilarski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 30 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Pilarski ( CPSO# 61080 )

Business Address:
Suite 804
1243 Islington Avenue
Toronto ON  M8X 1Y9
Phone Number: (416) 762-1233

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BARBARA ANNE PILARSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PILARSKI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1990
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Feb 2016
Terms and conditions amended Effective: 31 Oct 2016
Terms and conditions amended Effective: 31 Oct 2016
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 31 Jan 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Feb 2017

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 31 Oct 2016
Summary:

On October 31, 2016, the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of 
Ontario found that Dr. Pilarski committed an act of professional misconduct in that she engaged 
in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine  that, having regard to all the 
circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or 
unprofessional. 
 
Dr. Pilarski, a family physician practicing medicine in Toronto, received her certificate of 
registration authorizing independent practice in Ontario in 1990. 
   
Dr. Pilarksi provided home care visits to Patient A, an elderly patient.  In the course of treating 
Patient A, Dr. Pilarski received and accepted gifts from her patient, including jewelry and 
money. 
 
Patient A was a patient in Dr. Pilarski’s office practice from 1991 until 2006.  In 2006, Patient A 
asked Dr. Pilarksi to see her at home as it was difficult for Patient A to get to Dr. Pilarki’s office.  
At the time, Patient A was in her 80s.   
 
Dr. Pilarski agreed to make home care visits for Patient A beginning in 2006.  Dr. Pilarski also 
took over care for Patient A’s elderly husband and provided treatment to him at home from about 
2008 until he was moved to a care facility in 2011.  Patient A’s husband died in 2013.   
 
Dr. Pilarski continued providing home care visits to Patient A up until approximately 2014, when 
Patient A’s adult child made a complaint to the College pertaining to Dr. Pilarski’s dealings with 
her mother.    
 
Between 2006 and 2014, Dr. Pilarksi treated Patient A for a variety of age-related health issues 
and primarily for long-standing anxiety and insomnia that were treated with medications, 
including Halcion, along with counselling from Dr. Pilarksi.  
 
Patient A and her husband were financially well off and came into substantial money in 
approximately 2007. 
 
In early 2014, Patient A’s adult child requested that Dr. Pilarski return the gifts Patient A had 
provided to Dr. Pilarski over the years.  
 
On January 16, 2014, Dr. Pilarski returned jewelry and other assorted items to Patient A’s adult 
child. An evaluation concluded that some of these items amounted to $8,150.00.  
 
Dr. Pilarski advised the College that she had kept all the items together over the years in order to 
return them at some point to the family.   
 
Dr. Pilarski accepted a blank cheque from Patient A in the amount of $5,000.00, dated May 
2010. Dr. Pilarksi inserted her husband’s name on the cheque as payee. Dr. Pilarski used the 
money to buy a fireplace, chairs and artwork to create a spa like retreat for her patients in her 
waiting room. Dr. Pilarski returned the $5,000.00 to Patient A by way of a cheque dated October 
13, 2016. 
 
In the summer of 2010, Dr. Pilarski accepted a gift of a few hundred euros from Patient A to be 
used by Dr. Pilarski’s children on a family vacation.  
 
PENALTY 
 
On October 31, 2016, the Discipline Committee ordered and directed that: 
   -  The Registrar suspend Dr. Pilarski’s Certificate of Registration for a three (3) month 
      period effective immediately. 
   -  The Registrar impose the following term, condition and limitation on Dr. Pilarski’s 
      certificate of registration: 
         -  At her own expense, Dr. Pilarski shall participate in and successfully complete, 
            within six (6) months of the date of this Order, individualized instruction in 
            medical ethics satisfactory to the College, with an instructor selected by the 
            College.  The instructor shall provide a summative report to the College including 
            his or her conclusion about whether the instruction was completed successfully by 
            Dr. Pilarski. 
   -  Dr. Pilarski appear before the panel to be reprimanded. 
   -  Dr. Pilarski pay costs to the College for a one day hearing in the amount of $5,000.00 
      within 30 days of the date of this Order.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): October 31, 2016