Pillersdorf, Solomon Joseph (CPSO#: 51344)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the West Indies, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 03 Dec 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2011