Pilon, Josee Louise (CPSO#: 65621)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
RCMP- Headquarters
73 Leikin Drive
M5_401R
Mailstop #40
Ottawa ON  K1A 0R2
Phone: (613) 843-3351
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSEE LOUISE PILON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PILON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 29 Jun 1992 to 28 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1993