Pilon, Marie Marguerite Louise (CPSO#: 27569)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jul 1975

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 1975

Summary

Former Names: Kennedy, Marie Marguerite Louise (used until: 16 Apr 1986 )     Pilon-Kennedy, Marie Marguerite Louise (used until: 10 May 1978 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Medical Expertise Division
Income Security Programs
140 promenade du Portage
Gatineau QC  K1A 0J9
Phone: (819) 654-2794

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIE MARGUERITE LOUISE PILON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PILON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1974
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1975