Pilon-Larose, Karine (CPSO#: 100184)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Ottawa Health Service
100 Marie-Curie private
Ottawa ON  K1N 6N5
Phone: (613) 564-3950
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Luis Rivero Lopez Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 11 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Rivero Lopez ( CPSO# 96339 )
Dr. K. Pilon-Larose ( CPSO# 100184)

Business Address:
Suite 101B
745 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8M5
Phone Number: (613) 749-4429

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jul 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KARINE PILON-LAROSE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PILON-LAROSE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 25 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Jul 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2016