Pinchuk, Brian Marshall (CPSO#: 79267)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 336
1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2J 1V1
Phone: (416) 492-1661
Fax: (416) 492-9723
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRIAN MARSHALL PINCHUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PINCHUK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Surgical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Surgical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008