Pineau, Linda Ann (CPSO#: 62175)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jan 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 408
564 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N6
Phone: (519) 570-1492
Fax: (519) 570-3387
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Linda Pineau Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 02 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Pineau ( CPSO# 62175 )

Business Address:
408 - 564 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N6
Phone Number: (519) 570-1492

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LINDA ANN PINEAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PINEAU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 1992