Pineda Rivas, Maria de Los Angeles (CPSO#: 93598)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: Pineda, Maria de Los Angeles (used until: 07 Feb 2016 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 100
2631 28th Avenue
Regina SK  S4S 6X3
Phone: (306) 586-1800

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 16 May 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIA DE LOS ANGELES PINEDA RIVAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PINEDA RIVAS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Feb 2016 to 13 Mar 2016
Elective Trainee - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

McMaster University, 14 Mar 2016 to 10 Apr 2016
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 19 Dec 2016 to 15 Jan 2017
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Feb 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Apr 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jan 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2017