Pineda Solis, Karen (CPSO#: 102398)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National Autonomous University of Mexico, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 02 Dec 2013 to 24 Feb 2014
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 25 Feb 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Dec 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Feb 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2015