Pinhas, Leora (CPSO#: 60935)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:University of Ottawa, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ontario Shores
Centre for Mental Health Sciences
700 Gordon Street
Whitby ON  L1N 5S9
Phone: (905) 430-4055
Fax: (905) 430-4056
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Ontario Shores Centre for Mental Health Sciences Whitby

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 31 Jan 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LEORA PINHAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PINHAS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1990