Pinto, Angelo (CPSO#: 59667)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jul 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Royal Courtyards
Suite L8 Lower Level
18 King Street East
Bolton ON  L7E 1E8
Phone: (905) 857-9906
Fax: (905) 857-9905
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1956 King Street
King City
Ontario
King City ON  L7B 1K9
Canada
Phone: (905) 857-4388
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

1956 King Street
King City
Ontario
King City ON  L7B 1K9
Canada
Phone: (905) 857-4388
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Angelo Pinto Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 27 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Pinto ( CPSO# 59667 )

Business Address:
The Royal Courtyards
Suite L8, Lower Level
18 King Street East
Bolton ON  L7E 1E8
Phone Number: (905) 857-9906

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANGELO PINTO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PINTO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1989