Pinto, Christopher (CPSO#: 27508)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jul 1975

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 18 Sep 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2388A Bloor Street West
Toronto ON  M6S 1P5
Phone: (416) 767-2525
Fax: (416) 234-9128
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christopher Pinto Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 03 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Pinto ( CPSO# 27508 )

Business Address:
2388A Bloor Street West
Toronto ON  M6S 1P5
Phone Number: (416) 767-2525

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1974
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Sep 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 18 Sep 2017

Pending Discipline Hearings

Summary: Allegations of Dr. Pinto’s professional misconduct have been referred to the Discipline Committee of the College. It is alleged that Dr. Pinto is incompetent and/or failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in his care of patients.

Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 18 Sep 2017 Active View Details [+]
            As from September 18, 2017, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Christopher Pinto, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Pinto to the College of
            Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                              UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                                ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                       of
                  
                                          DR. CHRISTOPHER PINTO
                                                ("Dr. Pinto")
                  
                                                       to 
                  
                              COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                                (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "Discipline Committee" means the Discipline Committee of the College;
                  
                  "NMS" means the Narcotics Monitoring System implemented under the
                  Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22, as amended;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public. 
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Pinto, certificate of registration number 27508, am a member of
                  the College.  

            (3)   I, Dr. Pinto, acknowledge that the College has received information
                  regarding my standard of practice and that the College is conducting an
                  investigation into the information. 

            (4)   I, Dr. Pinto, acknowledge that the College has accepted this Undertaking
                  in lieu of making an Order under section 25.4 of the Code at this time.

            (5)   I, Dr. Pinto, acknowledge that this Undertaking does not preclude the ICR
                  Committee from making an order at a later date in accordance with the
                  Code.

            (6)   I, Dr. Pinto, acknowledge that this Undertaking continues in force until
                  the matters currently being investigation are disposed of by a panel of
                  the ICR Committee or the Discipline Committee.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (7)   I, Dr. Pinto, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking
                  effective immediately.  

            (8)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Pinto, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor(s) acceptable to the College (the "Clinical
                        Supervisor(s).
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Pinto, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)'s undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor(s). The
                        Clinical Supervisor(s) will, at minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Meet with me at my Practice Location in person, or through
                              secure vide conference in a manner approved by the College,
                              once every two weeks.   The first meeting shall be in person,
                              and at least one meeting per month will be in person
                              thereafter.
                  
                        (ii)  Review at least fifteen (15) of my patient charts at every
                              meeting, which shall be selected by the Clinical
                              Supervisor(s) independent of my participation, on the basis
                              of the areas of concern identified in the medical inspector's
                              report(s), received October 17, 2016, and any concerns that
                              arise during the period of Clinical Supervision;
                  
                        (iii) Observe me in practice a half day, once every month;
                  
                        (iv)  Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews and
                              observation;
                  
                        (v)   Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor(s) deem necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        (vi)  Submit written reports to the College at least once every
                              month, or more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor(s) has
                              concerns about my standard of practice.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Pinto, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be
                        selected by the Clinical Supervisor(s) based on the areas of
                        concern identified in the report(s) of the medical inspector
                        received October 17, 2016, and concerns that may arise during the
                        period of Clinical Supervision.  I further acknowledge that at
                        least five (5) charts selected by the Clinical Supervisor(s) will
                        relate to my care and treatment of each of the following:
                  
                              1.    heart disease (e.g. congestive heart failure, coronary
                                    artery disease and atrial fibrillation);
                              2.    diabetic management; and
                              3.    opioid management for non-cancer pain.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Pinto, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "A" attached, and to abide by the
                        recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor(s).
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Pinto, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking, is signed and delivered to the College within fourteen
                        (14) days of the date I execute this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Pinto, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        fourteen (14) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Pinto, acknowledge that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (8)(e) and/or
                        (f) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time as I
                        have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Pinto, acknowledge that if I am required to cease practise
                        as a result of section (8)(g) above this will constitute a term,
                        condition or limitation on my Certificate of Registration and that
                        term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (9)   I, Dr. Pinto, undertake to inform the College of each and every location
                  that I practise or have privileges, including, but not limited to,
                  hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any jurisdiction (collectively
                  my "Practice Location(s)"), within five (5) days of executing this
                  Undertaking.  Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of
                  any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing
                  practice at that location.

            (10)  I, Dr. Pinto, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere with,
                  unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s) and and to any other
                  activity the College deems necessary in order to monitor my compliance
                  with the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (11)  I, Dr. Pinto, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee.

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (12)  I, Dr. Pinto, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (13)  I, Dr. Pinto, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (14)  I, Dr. Pinto, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
                  of Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (15)  I, Dr. Pinto, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
                  to any Chief(s) of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities,
                  at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (16)  I, Dr. Pinto, acknowledge that, in the event of a referral to the
                  Discipline Committee and in the event of an appeal of any Order of the
                  Discipline Committee, if the Discipline Committee has directed the
                  Registrar to revoke, suspend, or impose terms and conditions on my
                  certificate of registration, that Order will take effect immediately
                  despite any appeal.

            (17)  I, Dr. Pinto, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (18)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Pinto, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Pinto, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (18)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              Dr. Pinto is the subject of an investigation into allegations
                              of professional misconduct and/or incompetence.  
                  
                              Dr. Pinto must practise under the guidance of a Clinical
                              Supervisor acceptable to the College. 
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (19)  I, Dr. Pinto, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                  appropriate enquiries of OHIP, the Drug Program Services Branch, NMS
                  and/or any person who or institution that may have relevant information,
                  in order for the College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of
                  this Undertaking. 

            (20)  I, Dr. Pinto, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS consent
                  form(s), attached hereto as Appendix "B" and Appendix "C", respectively. 

            (21)  I, Dr. Pinto, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to all Clinical Supervisors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (22)  I, Dr. Pinto, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (23)  I, Dr. Pinto, give my irrevocable consent to all Clinical Supervisors and
                  Chiefs of Staff to disclose to the College, and to one another, any
                  information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                        set out at Appendix "A"; and/or
                  
                  (c)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking. 

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 19 Dec 2016
Summary:

On December 19, 2016, the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario 
found that Dr. Christopher Pinto committed an act of professional misconduct in that he has engaged in 
conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the 
circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or 
unprofessional. 
 
Dr. Pinto practises family medicine in Toronto, Ontario.  
 
On April 23, 2014, the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) considered a 
complaint that claimed that Dr. Pinto failed to administer his office practice in an appropriate manner by 
failing to provide a patient’s medical records to the Workers Safety Insurance Board (“WSIB”) when 
requested by both the WSIB and the complainant. The ICRC disposed of this complaint by requiring Dr. 
Pinto to attend the College to be cautioned and to require him to undertake a specified continuing 
education and remediation program (a “SCERP”).  
 
The ICRC identified the following concerns when it considered the complaint: 
   -  Dr. Pinto’s response to the complaint was that he was unable to find the requested records.  Dr. 
      Pinto is required to maintain an adult patient’s chart for 10 years from the date of the last entry 
      into the record.  He therefore ought to have had the records available when they were requested of 
      him in 2008; 
   -  Dr. Pinto maintained he could not find the records.  This is unacceptable, as it is a physician’s 
      responsibility to maintain records safely.  If Dr. Pinto could not find the file, as he claimed, he 
      should have told this to his patient and the WSIB in a timely fashion;  
   -  Dr. Pinto’s response to the WSIB requests for timely information was dismissive, and may have 
      had a deleterious effect on his patient’s welfare. 
 
The SCERP ordered requires Dr. Pinto to engage a preceptor acceptable to the College to complete the 
SCERP, and to: 
   -  engage in focused educational sessions with a preceptor acceptable to the College in the topic of 
      office practice and management.   
   -  maintain a log of requests for documentation throughout the preceptorship, noting all request 
      details, dates of requests and responses to the requests.  
   -  undergo a reassessment which will consist of a review of office practice and management 
      approximately six months following the completion of the preceptorship. 
 
Dr. Pinto appealed the decision to the Health Professions Appeal and Review Board (“HPARB”), which 
confirmed the ICRC’s decision. 
 
After the HPARB released its decision on June 2, 2015, the College’s Compliance Case Manager 
requested that Dr. Pinto propose the name of a preceptor for College approval so that Dr. Pinto could 
engage in the educational sessions ordered by the ICRC. Dr. Pinto proposed potential preceptors on June 
22, and then on August 7 and August 12, 2015, who were either unacceptable to the College or unwilling 
to perform the task requested.    
 
The Compliance Case Manager wrote to Dr. Pinto, through his counsel, on August 27, 2015 requesting 
that Dr. Pinto follow-up with a potential proposed preceptor.  Dr. Pinto, through his counsel, indicated he 
would follow up.  The Compliance Case Manager heard nothing further regarding this preceptor.  
 
The Compliance Case Manager wrote to Dr. Pinto, through his counsel, on September 14 and September 
23, 2015 requesting an update.  The College received no response for some time.  
 
On November 10, 2015, Dr. Pinto, through his counsel, was advised that if he did not provide the name of 
a preceptor by November 18, 2015, the Compliance Case Manager would bring this matter to the 
attention of the ICRC to consider his non-compliance with the SCERP. 
 
On November 16, 2015, Dr. Pinto proposed another preceptor.  However, the proposed preceptor had not 
been approached by Dr. Pinto and ultimately did not agree to act as preceptor.    
 
When the ICRC considered Dr. Pinto’s failure to comply with the SCERP on February 10, 2016, Dr. 
Pinto had still not obtained a preceptor by that time.  The ICRC referred allegations of professional 
misconduct to the Discipline Committee. 
 
Dr. Pinto did not propose an additional preceptor until March 17, 2016, after allegations of professional 
misconduct were referred to the Discipline Committee. The College finally received an executed 
undertaking from an acceptable preceptor on April 25, 2016, almost one year after HPARB confirmed the 
ICRC’s SCERP.  
 
Dr. Pinto’s preceptor provided a report to the College on August 15, 2016 and noted that Dr. Pinto has 
failed to maintain a log of requests for documentation (noting all request details, dates of requests and 
responses to the requests) as required in the ICRC’s Order, referred to in paragraph 5 above. Dr. Pinto had 
begun to create an electronic log, but it was not complete and did not contain the required information. 
 
PENALTY 
 
On December 19, 2016, the Discipline Committee ordered and directed that: 
   -  Dr. Pinto appear before the panel to be reprimanded.  
   -  Dr. Pinto to pay costs to the College in the amount of $5,000.00 within thirty (30) days of the date 
      this Order.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): December 19, 2016

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: September 18, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Christopher Pinto to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective September 18, 2017:

Dr. Pinto is the subject of an investigation into allegations of professional misconduct and/or incompetence.

Dr. Pinto must practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.