Pinto, Robin (CPSO#: 90529)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1333 Neilson Rd
Scarborough, Ontario
Scarborough ON  M1B 4Y9
Phone: (416) 291-7719
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robin Pinto Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 25 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Pinto ( CPSO# 90529 )

Business Address:
1333 Neilson Road
Suite 100
Scarborough ON  M1B 4Y9
Phone Number: (416) 291-7719

Business Address:
2 Buchan Court
Toronto ON  M2J 5A3
Phone Number: (416) 756-0066

Business Address:
541 Finch Avenue West
North York ON  M2R 3Y3

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBIN PINTO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PINTO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2011