Pinto, Sarah Rose (CPSO#: 79455)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Oct 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 207
840 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 5T2
Phone: (416) 463-1864
Fax: (647) 933-1151
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sarah R. Pinto Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 09 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Pinto ( CPSO# 79455 )

Business Address:
207 - 840 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 5T2
Phone Number: (416) 463-1864

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 18 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARAH ROSE PINTO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PINTO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Jul 2011
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2007