Pinto, Tanya Rita (CPSO#: 82621)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Community Outpatient Mental Health
Unit J
1225 Kennedy Road
Scarborough ON  M1P 4Y1
Phone: (416) 431-8135
Fax: (416) 431-8233
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

GAIN Clinic
3050 Lawrence Avenue
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Canada
Phone: (416) 431-8200 Ext. 6355
Fax: (416) 289-2961
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Outpatient Mental Health
381 Church Street
PO Box 1800
Markham ON L3P 7P3
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Canada
Phone: 905-972-7011
Fax: 905-472-7371
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pinto Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 30 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Pinto ( CPSO# 82621 )

Business Address:
Unit J
1225 Kennedy Road
Scarborough ON  M1P 4Y1
Phone Number: (416) 431-8135

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
Providence Health Care,Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Psychiatry Effective: 26 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TANYA RITA PINTO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PINTO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011