Piper, Hannah Grace (CPSO#: 92666)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 18 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 18 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Harvard Medical School, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Paediatric Surgery Effective: 28 Sep 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Apr 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Jun 2013