Pipher, Bruce Edward (CPSO#: 57017)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 31 Dec 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1998