Pipkin, Mauricio (CPSO#: 96396)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Universidade Luterana do Brasil, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 26 Aug 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 27 Aug 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016