Pirani, Mohamedraza Jafferali Kara (CPSO#: 30688)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 May 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 May 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, Gujarati, Kachchi, Swahili, Urdu

Education:Queen's University of Belfast, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Joseph Brant Memorial Hospital
Department of Radiology &
Diagnostic Imaging
1230 North Shore Boulevard
Burlington ON  L7R 4C4
Phone: (905) 632-3737 Ext. 1412
Fax: (905) 336-4148
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Timmins & District Hospital
Diagnostic Imaging
700 Ross Ave. East
Timmins On. P4N 8P2
Timmins ON  P4N 8P2
Canada
Phone: (705) 360-6014
Fax: (705) 360-6010
County: Territorial District of Cochrane
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Pirani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 21 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Pirani ( CPSO# 30688 )

Business Address:
Joseph Brant Memorial Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
1230 Northshore Boulevard
Burlington ON  L7R 4C4
Phone Number: (905) 632-3737

Business Address:
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
169 Main Street East
Grimsby ON  L3M 1P3
Phone Number: (905) 945-2253

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 24 Nov 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOHAMEDRAZA JAFFERALI KARA PIRANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PIRANI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 May 1979
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 12 Oct 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 May 1989