Pirbhai, Kalimuddin Hassanali (CPSO#: 29933)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jun 1978

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jun 1978

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati

Education:University College of East Africa, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1 Belton Boulevard
Suite 203
St Catharines ON  L2T 3Y4
Phone: (905) 682-5611
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. Pirbhai Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 27 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Pirbhai ( CPSO# 29933 )

Business Address:
Suite 203
1 Belton Boulevard
St Catharines ON  L2T 3Y4
Phone Number: (905) 682-5611

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 13 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KALIMUDDIN HASSANALI PIRBHAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PIRBHAI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1973
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 1978