Pirouzmand, Farhad (CPSO#: 67591)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jan 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jan 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Iranian

Education:University of Tehran, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite A131
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-5263
Fax: (416) 480-6085
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Farhad Pirouzmand Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Pirouzmand ( CPSO# 67591 )

Business Address:
Suite A131
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-5263

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 10 Nov 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FARHAD PIROUZMAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PIROUZMAND is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 28 Nov 1994
Resident 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 29 Nov 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 29 Nov 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 28 Nov 1995
Resident 2 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 29 Nov 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 28 Nov 1996
Resident 3 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 29 Nov 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
Resident 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Nov 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jan 2003