Piscione, Tino Domenic (CPSO#: 63700)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Aug 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Canadian Medical Protective Associa
875 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1S 5P1
Phone: (613) 725-2000
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 22 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TINO DOMENIC PISCIONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PISCIONE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Paediatric Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Paediatric Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Paediatric Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Paediatric Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 1992