Pistor, Lino Andre (CPSO#: 32742)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jul 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jul 1981

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone: (705) 759-3434 Ext. 4615
Fax: (705) 256-3494
Electoral District: 08
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

OATC
500 Queen Street East
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 2A1
Canada
Phone: (705) 759-8080
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08

Algoma Treatment and
Remand Centre
800 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0B5
Canada
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lino A. Pistor Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 27 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Pistor ( CPSO# 32742 )

Business Address:
Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone Number: (705) 759-3434

Business Address:
800 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0B5

Business Address:
500 Queen Street East
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 2A1
Phone Number: (705) 759-8080

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 06 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LINO ANDRE PISTOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PISTOR is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1981