Piszel, Lloyd Meech (CPSO#: 64155)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Oct 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Oct 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
14 Prince Arthur Avenue
Suite 309
Toronto ON  M5R 1A9
Phone: 4163993037
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 08 Sep 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LLOYD MEECH PISZEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PISZEL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1991 to 15 Jun 1992
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 1992
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 11 Aug 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2012