Pitcher, Harrison Timothy (CPSO#: 55536)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Sep 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 May 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
ThomasJefferson University Hospital
Suite 605E
1025 Walnut Street
Philadelphia,PA 19107
Philadelphia PA  19107
United States
Phone: (215) 955-6996
Fax: (215) 955-6010

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - North Dakota
USA - Pennsylvania

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 10 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiothoracic Surgery Effective: 07 Sep 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HARRISON TIMOTHY PITCHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PITCHER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1985 to 14 Jun 1986
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Sep 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 5 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 6 - Cardiothoracic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 7 - Cardiothoracic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 7 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 May 1991