Pittini, Richard John (CPSO#: 66758)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room C712
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4579
Fax: (416) 480-4588
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Richard Pittini Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 14 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Pittini ( CPSO# 66758 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room C712
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4579

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICHARD JOHN PITTINI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PITTINI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1998