Pittman, Carole Dianne (CPSO#: 71610)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 5
697 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G5
Phone: (519) 621-2828
Fax: (519) 621-4904
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

P.O. Box 9056
3570 King Street East
Kitchener ON  N2A 2W1
Canada
Phone: (519) 749-4300
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: CD Pittman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 09 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Pittman ( CPSO# 71610 )

Business Address:
3570 King Street East
Kitchener ON  N2A 2W1
Phone Number: (519) 749-4300

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital ACT Team
5 - 697 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G5
Phone Number: (519) 621-2828

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Freeport Site Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAROLE DIANNE PITTMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PITTMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2002